Financial history PHAKAMISA UK

Charity number: 1095757
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £60.70k £63.03k £129.71k £72.13k £42.80k
Total expenditure £62.24k £68.05k £58.71k £67.79k £80.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A