Financial history YORKSHIRE FILM ARCHIVE

Charity number: 1093468
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £414.51k £406.74k £460.13k £425.57k £445.53k
Total expenditure £431.33k £414.12k £450.28k £418.17k £360.03k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £23.42k