CRAMLINGTON TABLE TENNIS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cramlington Table Tennis Club is about making table tennis accessible to as many people as possible regardless of their ability. Our object is the promotion of community participation in a healthy activity by the provision of facilities for playing table tennis.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
Governance
- 24 January 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Gee | Chair | 04 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sam Nair | Trustee | 09 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Williamson | Trustee | 14 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP TEAH-SMITH | Trustee | 23 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
ALAN HEDLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL DUNN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR JOE SWINBURN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAIN WOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.76k | £11 | £10.38k | £16.72k | £16.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.63k | £676 | £5.82k | £18.56k | £18.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 12 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 21 May 2024 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 31 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 AUGUST 1995 AS AMENDED 18 AUGUST 1998, 4 AUGUST 1999 AND 16 DECEMBER 2002.
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING TABLE TENNIS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
92 Anton Place
CRAMLINGTON
Northumberland
NE23 6JJ
- Phone:
- 07513210960
- Email:
- mark@cramlingtontt.club
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window