ST VIGOR AND ST JOHN PTFA

Charity number: 1093398
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £8.56k £14.16k £14.22k £14.15k £10.13k
Total expenditure £13.14k £7.33k £22.42k £4.92k £2.76k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A