ANIMAL RESCUE AND CARE

Charity number: 1095004
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £34.81k £38.95k £102.91k £52.77k £66.78k
Total expenditure £42.27k £35.52k £43.74k £50.83k £65.09k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A