THE BOATERS CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Christian worship, Christian witness and Christian fellowship for the canal boating community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
23 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- France
- Germany
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 09 December 2003: Standard registration
- BOATERS CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jan Halford | Chair | 16 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Ann Forshaw | Trustee | 14 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Andrew Forshaw | Trustee | 14 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Paul SMITH | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Fergus James McCloghry | Trustee | 07 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Gillian Margaret Speight | Trustee | 27 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
John David Speight | Trustee | 27 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev STEPHEN HOWARD CARTER | Trustee | 15 November 2014 |
|
|||||
PETER JOHN BRAYBROOK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.14k | £12.95k | £14.80k | £13.23k | £13.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.39k | £12.82k | £14.58k | £14.79k | £13.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 21 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 03 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 25 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 17 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09 NOV 2002 AS AMENDED ON 08 NOV 2003 AS AMENDED ON 06 DEC 2017 as amended on 15 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONALLY
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old Barn
Driffield
CIRENCESTER
Gloucestershire
GL7 5PY
- Phone:
- 01285 851912
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window