Accounts and annual returns THE BANISTER CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1102320
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 20 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 14 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 14 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 08 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 08 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 07 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 07 February 2017 On time Download Open in new window