Financial history THE BANISTER CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1102320
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £293.56k £597.23k £1.37m £2.66m £1.76m
Total expenditure £308.47k £1.09m £1.48m £3.20m £1.71m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £1.38m £1.96m £974.13k £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A £1.38m £1.67m £974.13k £0
Income - Investment N/A £190.04k £288.58k £290.18k £196.32k
Income - Other N/A £407.19k £1.09m £2.37m £1.57m
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £911.96k £1.38m £3.09m £1.62m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £174.61k £99.87k £102.65k £88.64k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £1.62k £1.62k £2.10k £2.10k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £910.34k £1.38m £3.09m £1.62m
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £174.61k £99.87k £102.65k £88.64k
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0