Accounts and annual returns CHALLENGE COMMUNITY CHURCH HEREFORD

Charity number: 1095786
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 26 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 26 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 05 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 05 May 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 23 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 23 March 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 25 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 25 March 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2016 19 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 19 June 2017 On time Download Open in new window