BRISTOL LESBIAN GAY BISEXUAL AND TRANSGENDER FORUM

Charity number: 1098085
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance the education of the public in all aspects of discrimination suffered by reason of sexual orientation and in particular by relieving discrimination and hardship and by removing barriers to equal participation and social benefits, that may be suffered by lesbian, gay, bisexual and transgender people who are in need, in such ways that are charitable in law

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019

Total income: £33,476
Total expenditure: £39,295

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Bristol City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 June 2003: Standard registration
  • 01 October 2020: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • BRISTOL LESBIAN GAY BISEXUAL FORUM (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £57.35k £65.22k £47.45k £56.63k £33.48k
Total expenditure £48.47k £50.72k £58.99k £50.18k £39.30k
Income from government contracts £0 £23.00k £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £56.73k £28.14k £46.62k £55.29k £33.04k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2018 09 January 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 09 January 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2017 23 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 January 2018 On Time