AFGHANISTAN & CENTRAL ASIAN ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1096908
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 28 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 28 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2019 05 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 05 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2018 19 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 19 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2017 27 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 27 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2016 19 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 11 May 2017 On time Download