Financial history AFGHANISTAN & CENTRAL ASIAN ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1096908
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021
Total gross income £84.69k £298.46k £411.12k £996.74k £963.28k
Total expenditure £88.51k £256.64k £404.24k £671.59k £616.23k
Income from government contracts £0 £10.00k N/A £6.00k N/A
Income from government grants £44.02k £10.00k N/A £6.00k £39.50k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £986.64k £962.03k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £10.10k £1.25k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £671.59k £616.23k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 £5.32k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0