Trustees THE BEVAN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1104191
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gavin Paul Billy Thompson Chair 15 June 2023
None on record
Bishop John David Edward Davies Trustee 13 April 2021
None on record
Shavanah Taj Trustee 12 April 2021
PEOPLE'S HEALTH TRUST
Received: On time
Richard Andrew Williams Trustee 12 April 2021
CYMRU FOOTBALL FOUNDATION LIMITED
Received: 2 days late
John Beresford Chown Trustee 29 January 2020
DARING TO DREAM
Received: On time
Tamsin Stirling Trustee 23 January 2019
CARDIFF CIVIC SOCIETY
Received: On time
COUNCILLOR ANTHONY HUNT Trustee 19 July 2018
MIC MORRIS MEMORIAL SPORTING TRUST FUND
Received: On time
Professor Sally Power Trustee 17 May 2018
BRITISH EDUCATIONAL RESEARCH ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
ACADEMY OF SOCIAL SCIENCES
Received: On time
Lynne Hughes Trustee 17 May 2018
None on record
Duncan Scott Forbes Trustee 11 December 2014
None on record