RAPAR (REFUGEE AND ASYLUM SEEKER PARTICIPATORY ACTION RESEARCH)

Charity number: 1095961
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Annual return 31 March 2019 09 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 09 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 07 February 2019 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 07 February 2019 7 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 15 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 30 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required