Financial history RAPAR (REFUGEE AND ASYLUM SEEKER PARTICIPATORY ACTION RESEARCH)

Charity number: 1095961
Charity reporting is overdue by 240 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £24.21k £27.60k £57.40k £72.48k £126.47k
Total expenditure £15.27k £33.28k £55.43k £51.51k £92.93k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A