Financial history CHRESTOS MISSION

Charity number: 1095325
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £151.87k £168.65k £136.89k £181.53k £100.01k
Total expenditure £168.73k £170.40k £167.47k £150.81k £140.25k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A