CHRESTOS MISSION

Charity number: 1095325
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANTHONY JOHN HARROP MA, MBA Chair
VIA DESIGN Received: On time
Norman John Silverstone Trustee 13 May 2017 None on record
JACQUELINE JENNIFER WELLS Trustee 05 May 2018 None on record
Rosslyn Anne Hill Trustee 05 May 2018 None on record
NEIL JOHN HARDY Trustee 11 May 2014 None on record
Peter Maycock Trustee 08 May 2016 None on record
REV EDWARD FRANK GOVEIA Trustee 05 November 2016
MISSION FELLOWSHIP INTERNATIONAL Received: On time
PAMELA SHEPHERD Trustee 10 May 2015
PRO AUTISM PARENTS RELATIVES AND OTHERS FOR AUTISM Received: On time