Accounts and annual returns HAFAL

Charity number: 1093747
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 13 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 25 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 01 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 29 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 28 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window