THE BARTIMAEUS CHRISTIAN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1096372
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2014 Overdue Overdue by 2287 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Overdue Overdue by 2287 days
Annual return 31 March 2013 15 January 2014 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2012 20 December 2012 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 20 December 2012 On time
Annual return 31 March 2011 12 July 2012 163 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 12 July 2012 163 days late
Annual return 31 March 2010 23 July 2010 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required