Accounts and annual returns ABU BAKR TRUST

Charity number: 1108415
Charity reporting is up to date (23 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 23 July 2022 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 July 2022 23 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 23 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 27 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

27 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 28 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 28 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 26 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 26 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window