Financial history ABU BAKR TRUST

Charity number: 1108415
Charity reporting is up to date (302 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £1.96m £2.25m £1.93m £2.01m £1.91m
Total expenditure £1.71m £2.01m £1.98m £2.04m £2.30m
Income from government contracts £122.55k £139.44k £200.24k £227.42k £195.93k
Income from government grants N/A N/A £308.94k £208.65k £20.29k
Income - Donations and legacies £361.22k £449.68k £175.81k £126.98k £215.10k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.58m £1.77m £1.68m £1.82m £1.64m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £14.42k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £965 £32.62k £72.86k £65.10k £57.21k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.71m £2.01m £1.98m £2.04m £2.30m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0