SRI LANKA ISLAMIC (UK) ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1098114
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £48.25k £119.18k £56.70k £26.32k £16.22k
Total expenditure £36.15k £72.97k £40.50k £27.20k £19.99k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A