THE LEVANTINE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1094436
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £0 £47.40k £0 £0 £98.22k
Total expenditure £14.24k £51.76k £7.69k £1.71k £90.72k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A £95.26k