Accounts and annual returns WILLIAM HOLY HASTED TRUST

Charity number: 1098684
Charity reporting is up to date (33 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 03 July 2022 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 22 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 22 September 2020 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 24 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 02 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required