Financial history WILLIAM HOLY HASTED TRUST

Charity number: 1098684
Charity reporting is up to date (33 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £20.88k £18.65k £3.51k £1.00k £11.00k
Total expenditure £20.07k £15.00k £15.00k £15.00k £15.00k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A