Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S ON THE HEATH

Charity number: 1095393
Charity reporting is overdue by 137 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 137 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 137 days
Annual return 30 April 2022 01 March 2023 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 29 March 2022 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 28 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 09 March 2020 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required