Financial history FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S ON THE HEATH

Charity number: 1095393
Charity reporting is overdue by 137 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022
Total gross income £3.12k £3.58k £3.43k £2.44k £2.29k
Total expenditure £2.96k £2.85k £4.61k £2.68k £3.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A