COMMUNITY WORKS CIO

Charity number: 1096518
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 20 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 06 February 2020 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 06 February 2020 6 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 13 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 13 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 14 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

14 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 14 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 14 December 2016 On time Download