Accounts and annual returns BEDFORD SCHOOL TRUST

Charity number: 1094232
Charity reporting is overdue by 68 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 Overdue Overdue by 68 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Overdue Overdue by 68 days
Annual return 30 June 2020 18 October 2021 171 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 18 October 2021 171 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 29 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 29 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2018 11 June 2019 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 11 June 2019 42 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2017 19 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 19 February 2018 On time Download Open in new window