Financial history BEDFORD SCHOOL TRUST

Charity number: 1094232
Charity reporting is overdue by 62 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £1.07m £885.55k £1.92m £613.64k £2.00m
Total expenditure £1.10m £1.05m £956.83k £739.40k £649.35k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.44m £2.36m £949.24k £23.50k £1.43m
Income - Other trading activities £38.98k £22.61k £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £662.52k £457.48k £511.29k £115.03k £95.23k
Income - Endowments £1.40m £2.35m £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £307.98k £379.02k £423.43k £474.93k £479.50k
Income - Other £24.66k £26.45k £35.24k £171 £950
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £949.24k £0 £1.41m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.05m £995.51k £898.39k £677.59k £583.17k
Expenditure - Raising funds £50.03k £52.58k £58.43k £61.81k £66.17k
Expenditure - Governance £10.41k £0 £7.40k £17.03k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £35.15k £0 £23.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £42.14k £49.30k £58.43k £61.81k £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0