Trustees BEDFORD SCHOOL TRUST

Charity number: 1094232
Charity reporting is overdue by 66 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JAMES SIMON HODGSON Chair 01 September 2014
ALDWICKBURY SCHOOL TRUST LTD
Overdue by 35 days
BEECHWOOD PARK SCHOOL LIMITED
Received: On time
Ian Peck Trustee 21 March 2020
None on record
ROGER MARKS Trustee 22 June 2019
None on record
PHILIP JOHN McDUELL Trustee 25 March 2017
None on record
MARK HALL Trustee 12 November 2016
None on record
Dr Daniel Robert Koch Trustee 12 October 2016
None on record
Nicholas JONES Trustee 20 June 2015
None on record