THE COLLEGE OF ST MARY MAGDALEN IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD

Charity number: 1142149
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

72 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PROF TIMOTHY DONOHOE Trustee 27 July 2011 None on record
PROF KATHARINE GREVLING Trustee 27 July 2011 None on record
MARK WILLIAMS Trustee 01 January 2017
MUSIC EDUCATION FOR ZAMBIA TRUST Received: On time
PROF RODERICK BAGSHAW Trustee 27 July 2011 None on record
Prof AVI LIFSCHITZ Trustee 01 October 2017 None on record
PROF CHRISTIAN LEITMEIR Trustee 01 October 2015 None on record
PROF FELIX BUDELMANN Trustee 27 July 2011 None on record
PROF DAVID CLARK Trustee 05 October 2011 None on record
PROF SIMON HOROBIN Trustee 27 July 2011 None on record
Dr THOMAS NORMAN Trustee 27 July 2011 None on record
PROF PETER SULLIVAN Trustee 27 July 2011 None on record
Dr FARHAN NIZAMI Trustee 08 March 2013 None on record
MARK BLANDFORD-BAKER Trustee 27 July 2011
SPORT ALLIES Received: On time
Dr Keru Cai Trustee 01 October 2020 None on record
PROF JANE GINGRICH Trustee 01 November 2013 None on record
Prof Raphaele Garrod Trustee 01 October 2018 None on record
Prof Joseph Sampson Trustee 01 October 2018 None on record
PROF PAUL ELBOURNE Trustee 01 September 2015 None on record
Prof Bernhard Salow Trustee 01 October 2018 None on record
PROF GILES BARR Trustee 27 July 2011 None on record
PROF CONSTANTIN COUSSIOS Trustee 27 July 2011 None on record
Rory Maw Trustee 10 March 2014 None on record
PROF QUENTIN SATTENTAU Trustee 27 July 2011 None on record
PROF NICHOLAS STARGARDT Trustee 27 July 2011 None on record
PROF MARILYN BOOTH Trustee 01 October 2014 None on record
PROF JULIEN BERESTYCKI Trustee 01 July 2014 None on record
PROF LAURIE MAGUIRE Trustee 27 July 2011 None on record
PROF HARVEY WHITEHOUSE Trustee 27 July 2011 None on record
Dr Anthony Shillito Trustee 01 October 2019 None on record
Dr Ha-Ram Park Trustee 01 March 2020 None on record
Prof Paul Billingham Trustee 01 April 2018 None on record
THE REVD PROF ROB GILBERT Trustee 27 July 2011 None on record
Dr Signe Larsen Trustee 01 October 2020 None on record
PROF LUCY BOWES Trustee 01 October 2014 None on record
Dr ALEXY KARENOWSKA Trustee 03 October 2011 None on record
Dr Michelle Pfeffer Trustee 01 October 2020 None on record
PROF STEPHEN GOODWIN Trustee 27 July 2011 None on record
Prof JUAN-CARLOS CONDE Trustee 27 July 2011 None on record
PROF ADRIAN HILL Trustee 27 July 2011 None on record
Prof Jeremias Adams-Prassl Trustee 01 October 2014 None on record
PROF CLARE HARRIS Trustee 27 July 2011 None on record
Dr Yujia Qing Trustee 01 October 2020 None on record
Prof OFRA MAGIDOR Trustee 01 October 2016 None on record
PROF ANDREW SMITH Trustee 27 July 2011 None on record
PROF MARTIN BRIDSON Trustee 27 July 2011 None on record
Dr JENNIFER CASTLE Trustee 27 July 2011 None on record
PROF ROBERT DOUGLAS-FAIRHURST Trustee 27 July 2011 None on record
PROF ROBIN CLEVELAND Trustee 05 October 2011
THE MAGDALEN COLLEGE DEVELOPMENT TRUST Received: On time
PROF CHRISTOPHER GARLAND Trustee 27 July 2011 None on record
PROF ARZHANG ARDAVAN Trustee 27 July 2011 None on record
PROF JOHN GREGG Trustee 27 July 2011 None on record
PROF ZHONG YOU Trustee 27 July 2011 None on record
Dr ALFONSO MORENO Trustee 27 July 2011 None on record
Prof Timothy Barraclough Trustee 01 September 2019 None on record
PROF LAURA FORTUNATO Trustee 01 October 2013 None on record
Dinah Rose QC Chair 01 September 2020
CHARLES AND JULIA HENRY FUND Received: On time
PROF JOHN NIGHTINGALE Trustee 27 July 2011 None on record
PROF GERO MIESENBOECK Trustee 27 July 2011 None on record
PROF SIAN POOLEY Trustee 01 October 2014 None on record
Dr Marcello Cattaneo Trustee 01 October 2019 None on record
Dr REIDAR DUE Trustee 27 July 2011 None on record
The Revd Dr Andrew Bowyer Trustee 01 July 2019 None on record
PROF ANDREW TURBERFIELD Trustee 27 July 2011 None on record
Dr ELISABETH BOLORINOS ALLARD Trustee 01 January 2018 None on record
Heather Ebner Trustee 01 November 2019 None on record
PROF STUART MACKENZIE Trustee 27 July 2011 None on record
PROF JAN KRISTENSEN Trustee 27 July 2011 None on record
Prof Richard Cornall Trustee 01 July 2019 None on record
Professor Simon Ashley Gilson Trustee 01 January 2018
SOCIETY FOR ITALIAN STUDIES Received: 25 days late
THE MODERN HUMANITIES RESEARCH ASSOCIATION Received: On time
PROF RAHUL SANTHANAM Trustee 01 January 2016 None on record
PROF ALISON ETHERIDGE Trustee 27 July 2011 None on record
Dr MARK POBJOY Trustee 27 July 2011 None on record