ST PETER'S BRATTON OUT OF SCHOOL CLUB

Charity number: 1094381
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 23 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 04 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

04 January 2017 On time Download