ST PETER'S BRATTON OUT OF SCHOOL CLUB

Charity number: 1094381
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £100.43k £98.82k £109.36k £116.28k £113.07k
Total expenditure £107.27k £92.56k £121.82k £102.74k £105.15k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A