ANGLIA CHURCH TRUST

Charity number: 1097275
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £2.31k £2.39k £1.30k £20.28k £74
Total expenditure £6.31k £2.83k £3.56k £4.48k £965
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A