Accounts and annual returns ST JUST & DISTRICT COMMUNITY SPORTS ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1094476
Charity reporting is up to date (43 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2021 12 January 2022 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 12 January 2022 43 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2020 07 December 2020 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 07 December 2020 7 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2019 04 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 04 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2018 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 31 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2017 11 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 11 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window