ST JUST & DISTRICT COMMUNITY SPORTS ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide top quality sports facilities for the use of the local community at an affordable rate. To encourage participation regardless of age or ability.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
Total income includes £750 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cornwall
Governance
- 04 November 2002: Standard registration
- ST JUST SPORTS CENTRE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Josephine Warburton | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alexander Robert Rowe | Trustee | 23 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Price-Watts | Trustee | 23 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Andrew Shawcross | Trustee | 23 November 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.31k | £48.18k | £66.36k | £56.97k | £60.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.43k | £41.14k | £54.91k | £72.01k | £80.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.00k | £27.89k | £31.12k | £10.25k | £750 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 10 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 10 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 21 February 2024 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 21 February 2024 | 83 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 12 January 2023 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 12 January 2023 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 12 January 2022 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 12 January 2022 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 07 December 2020 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 07 December 2020 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION ADOPTED 30TH JANUARY 2002
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY OF ST.JUST AND SURROUNDING DISTRICT IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE ST. JUST
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Just Sports Centre
Cape Cornwall Street
St. Just
Penzance
TR19 7JX
- Phone:
- 01736787856
- Email:
- accounts@go-stjust.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window