Trustees GENERAL AVIATION SAFETY COUNCIL
Charity number: 1094175

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Captain Nils Jamieson | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Tilling | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert George Hughes | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Russell William Mason | Trustee | 16 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martin Robinson | Trustee | 24 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Slater | Trustee | 28 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Walkinshaw | Trustee | 25 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Philip Andrew Hall | Trustee | 26 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
WG CDR GARY COLEMAN RAF | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.