Accounts and annual returns THE ST CUTHBERT'S TRUST PORTSMOUTH

Charity number: 1102652
Charity reporting is up to date (123 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 01 August 2022 123 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 21 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 21 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 22 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 21 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

08 March 2018 36 days late Download Open in new window