Accounts and annual returns ONE WORLD FOUNDATION AFRICA

Charity number: 1098889
Charity reporting is overdue by 5 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 5 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 5 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 April 2022 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 07 April 2022 66 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 28 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window