Financial history ONE WORLD FOUNDATION AFRICA

Charity number: 1098889
Charity reporting is overdue by 6 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £52.36k £66.99k £25.63k £19.41k £42.59k
Total expenditure £50.90k £55.67k £37.68k £19.18k £44.79k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £19.92k N/A N/A £13.66k £1.00k