THE BORDER HOLIDAY GROUP

Charity number: 1099217
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2013 Overdue Overdue by 2654 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Overdue Overdue by 2654 days
Annual return 31 March 2012 Overdue Overdue by 3019 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Overdue Overdue by 3019 days
Annual return 31 March 2011 07 December 2011 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2010 27 November 2010 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 05 November 2010 On time
Annual return 31 March 2009 11 August 2009 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 11 August 2009 On time