THE BORDER HOLIDAY GROUP

Charity number: 1099217
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011
Total gross income £14.57k £14.79k £23.57k £13.08k £15.45k
Total expenditure £15.33k £15.19k £10.80k £24.24k £3.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A