ANIMAL CANCER TRUST

Charity number: 1094779
Charity reporting is up to date (16 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2019 16 October 2020 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 16 October 2020 16 days late Download
Annual return 31 May 2018 11 March 2020 346 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 11 March 2020 346 days late Download
Annual return 31 May 2017 29 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2016 18 July 2017 109 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2015 28 April 2016 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2015 Not Required