Trustees MENDIP COMMUNITY TRANSPORT
Charity Number: 1094918
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rod Harris | Trustee | 24 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Heather Shearer | Trustee | 31 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stephen John Neads | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Reynolds | Trustee | 03 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bryan Craig Knickerbocker | Trustee | 03 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Leworthy | Trustee | 09 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bob Powell | Trustee | 11 January 2017 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.