QDOS CREATES LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To inspire and enable individuals to make a difference to their lives and communities through creative art experiences that embody quality, value and excellence. Our work is a catalyst for change- striving to empower individuals, re build lives and ultimately lead to social change by continuing to tackle challenging issues in society and giving a voice to vulnerable people and communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barnsley
- City Of York
- Derbyshire
- Rotherham
- Isle Of Man
Governance
- 21 May 2003: Standard registration
- 06 February 2024: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- QDOS DANCE THEATRE (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £63.26k | £101.07k | £83.39k | £18.89k | £12 | |
|
Total expenditure | £85.34k | £89.48k | £60.37k | £61.06k | £8.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £24.72k | £24.71k | £11.76k | £8.96k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £18.87k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 FEBRUARY 2000 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF CHANGE OF NAME DATED 2 MAY 2001 AND 20 JULY 2009
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROMOTION OF THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE ART OF DANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window