ST MARY'S COLLEGE SPORTS DEVELOPMENT COMPANY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of a gym, dance studio, sports hall & various fitness classes to the community and young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kingston Upon Hull City
Governance
- 24 February 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Laws | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Teasdale | Trustee | 31 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
PETER ALLEN FEARNLEY | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £159.97k | £142.38k | £164.81k | £137.07k | £141.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £303.86k | £268.15k | £275.50k | £151.16k | £298.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £42.14k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 19 August 2024 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 19 August 2024 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 06 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 06 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 10 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 10 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 10 February 2022 | 225 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 10 February 2022 | 225 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 06 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 06 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 8 AUGUST 2002.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF ST MARY'S COLLEGE AT CRANBROOK AVENUE KINGSTON UPON HULL ("THE COLLEGE") BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES WHICH WILL ENABLE THEM TO PLAY SPORTS INSOFAR AS SUCH FACILITIES ARE NOT REQUIRED FOR THE PUPILS OF THE COLLEGE THEY SHALL BE MADE AVAILABLE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR HEALTHFUL RECREATION FOR THE PUBLIC WITH PARTICULAR REGARD FOR THE NEEDS OF THE YOUNG AGED INFIRM AND DISABLED.
Area of benefit
KINGSTON UPON HULL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. MARYS COLLEGE
CRANBROOK AVENUE
HULL
HU6 7TN
- Phone:
- 01482851136
- Email:
- arookes@smchull.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window