BOSLEY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1094545
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £8.76k £8.96k £8.57k £8.87k £8.65k
Total expenditure £5.96k £7.29k £2.34k £5.84k £6.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A