ST MARY'S THURSDAY CLUB

Charity number: 1095432
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/03/2018 31/05/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £23.89k £20.51k £9.41k £15.15k £9.86k
Total expenditure £12.68k £12.55k £10.80k £14.49k £14.49k
Income from government contracts £0 £15.14k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £8.81k £0 N/A £6.60k N/A