THE FRIENDS OF ST. MARY'S CHURCH EAST BRABOURNE

Charity number: 1095462
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 26 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 14 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 06 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 29 April 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required